SL.No | Name Of The Principal | Period | |
FROM | TO | ||
1. | Sri.B.V.Subba Reddy | 01-11-1993 | 08-03-1994 |
2. | Sri.B.S.K.L.Sathyanarayana | 09-03-1994 | 18-01-1995 |
3. | Dr.U.Sreeramurthy | 01-02-1995 | 23-11-1995 |
4. | Dr.M.Sarat Babu | 24-11-1995 | 04-07-1995 |
5. | Kum.K.Pushpavally | 05-07-1996 | 27-08-2022 |
6. | Dr.M.Sarat Babu | 20-01-2003 | 07-08-2003 |
7. | Dr.N.Sashikala | 06-09-2003 | 24-02-2004 |
8. | Dr.A.V.Subbaiah | 25-02-2004 | 30-06-2004 |
9. | Sri.S.Muradalikhan | 07-10-2004 | 06-07-2005 |
10. | Sri. S.S.padmakar | 04-08-2005 | 18-02-2007 |
11. | Sri.P.Venkata Ramudu | 19-02-2007 | 31-07-2007 |
12. | Dr.P.Madhava Reddy | 01-08-2007 | 30-11-2007 |
13. | Dr.N.Balakrishna | 01-12-2007 | 15-06-2011 |
14. | Dr.B.Vijaya Kumar | 17-06-2011 | 15-09-2012 |
15. | Dr.J.Nageswara Rao | 25-09-2012 | 31-07-2013 |
16. | Dr.K.Veeracgari | 15-11-2013 | 01-07-2014 |
17. | Dr.G.Tirumalaiah | 23-07-2014 | 02-07-2015 |
18. | Dr.P.Malyadri | 03-07-2015 | 31-08-2018 |
19. | Dr.S.Sharwani | 01-09-2018 | 22-01-2019 |
20. | Sri.Ch.Rajkumar | 01-03-2019 | 17-01-2020 |
21. | Dr.B.Sasikala Devi | 18-01-2020 | 31-03-2021 |
22. | Sri.Ch.Rajkumar | 01-04-2021 | 31-08-2021 |
23. | Dr.P.Hussaian Bash | 01-09-2021 | TILL DATE |
To promote quality enhancement through internalization of quality control and institutionalization of quality culture and best practices, the IQAC is constituted on 3rd July 2016 with the following members.
The membership of the above nominated shall be for period of 2 years. The members of IQAC shall shoulder the responsibilities of generating and promoting awareness in the institution and to devote time for working out the procedural details. The IQAC committee may meet at least once in a quarter to discuss about the development and application of quality bench marks/ parameters for the various academic and administrative activities of the college